California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 12, 2014
Bill June 23, 2014
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013