California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 17, 2013
Bill May 1, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013