LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB525
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB525
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB525
Compare Versions
AB525 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB525 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB525 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB525 Amended June 17, 2013
AB525 Amended May 1, 2013
AB525 Amended April 4, 2013
AB525 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB525 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB525 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB525 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB525 Amended June 17, 2013
AB525 Amended May 1, 2013
AB525 Amended April 4, 2013
AB525 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare