California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2013

Amended

Bill June 3, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013