LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB533
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB533
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB533
Compare Versions
AB533 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB533 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB533 Amended June 3, 2013
AB533 Amended April 18, 2013
AB533 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB533 Chaptered August 13, 2013
AB533 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB533 Amended June 3, 2013
AB533 Amended April 18, 2013
AB533 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare