California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill August 15, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013