LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB535
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB535
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB535
Compare Versions
AB535 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB535 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB535 Amended August 15, 2013
AB535 Amended April 10, 2013
AB535 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB535 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB535 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB535 Amended August 15, 2013
AB535 Amended April 10, 2013
AB535 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare