|
10/02/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3073.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2233.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1714.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|