California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB56 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 10, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013
Bill March 11, 2013