|
07/08/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5694.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3929.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3658.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|