California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2014

Amended

Bill June 4, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014