|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2090.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 798.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|