California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill April 2, 2013
Bill February 27, 2013