|
06/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 23, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 5370.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3143.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1747.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|