California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2014

Amended

Bill February 24, 2014
Bill February 12, 2014
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 13, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013