|
07/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5738.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3757.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 1791.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1651.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|