LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB600
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB600
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB600
Compare Versions
AB600 Chaptered July 18, 2014
AB600 Enrolled July 2, 2014
AB600 Amended March 17, 2014
AB600 Amended May 28, 2013
AB600 Amended March 19, 2013
AB600 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB600 Chaptered July 18, 2014
AB600 Enrolled July 2, 2014
AB600 Amended March 17, 2014
AB600 Amended May 28, 2013
AB600 Amended March 19, 2013
AB600 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare