Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1761.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1104.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on U. & C. and J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|