LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB628
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB628
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB628
Compare Versions
AB628 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB628 Enrolled September 19, 2013
AB628 Amended September 11, 2013
AB628 Amended September 4, 2013
AB628 Amended August 12, 2013
AB628 Amended July 10, 2013
AB628 Amended May 8, 2013
AB628 Amended April 24, 2013
AB628 Amended April 1, 2013
AB628 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB628 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB628 Enrolled September 19, 2013
AB628 Amended September 11, 2013
AB628 Amended September 4, 2013
AB628 Amended August 12, 2013
AB628 Amended July 10, 2013
AB628 Amended May 8, 2013
AB628 Amended April 24, 2013
AB628 Amended April 1, 2013
AB628 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare