|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3200.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and APPR. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3032.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1332.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|