California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill June 26, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013