Senate
|
02/04/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|