LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB687
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB687
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB687
Compare Versions
AB687 Amended February 4, 2014
AB687 Amended July 10, 2013
AB687 Amended May 24, 2013
AB687 Amended April 10, 2013
AB687 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB687 Amended February 4, 2014
AB687 Amended July 10, 2013
AB687 Amended May 24, 2013
AB687 Amended April 10, 2013
AB687 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare