LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB690
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB690
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB690
Action History
Assembly
09/12/2013
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Assembly
09/11/2013
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
04/15/2013
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
03/11/2013
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
Assembly
02/22/2013
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
Assembly
02/21/2013
Read first time. To print.