California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill January 23, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill September 11, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013