California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill March 11, 2013