LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB691
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB691
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB691
Compare Versions
AB691 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB691 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB691 Amended August 12, 2013
AB691 Amended July 1, 2013
AB691 Amended April 22, 2013
AB691 Amended March 11, 2013
AB691 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB691 Chaptered October 5, 2013
AB691 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB691 Amended August 12, 2013
AB691 Amended July 1, 2013
AB691 Amended April 22, 2013
AB691 Amended March 11, 2013
AB691 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare