Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 1840.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|