California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Amended

Bill July 3, 2014
Bill June 3, 2014
Bill July 11, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013