Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Taken up without reference to file by unanimous consent. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2354.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Measure version as amended on September 4 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Page 2190.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2190.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1042.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|