California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill June 3, 2013