|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 3109.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2266.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 21. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|