LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB711
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB711
Compare Versions
AB711 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB711 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB711 Amended September 4, 2013
AB711 Amended September 3, 2013
AB711 Amended June 12, 2013
AB711 Amended April 17, 2013
AB711 Amended March 19, 2013
AB711 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB711 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB711 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB711 Amended September 4, 2013
AB711 Amended September 3, 2013
AB711 Amended June 12, 2013
AB711 Amended April 17, 2013
AB711 Amended March 19, 2013
AB711 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare