California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013