BILL NUMBER: AB 714ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 2, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wieckowski (Coauthor: Assembly Member Harkey) FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act relating to the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 714, Wieckowski. Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Fund. Existing law, the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999, authorizes the University of California to establish a spinal cord injury research fund, independent of the State Treasury, to accept public and private funds for purposes of spinal cord injury research, as specified. This bill would appropriate $1,000,000 from the General Fund to the spinal cord injury research fund authorized by the act. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. There is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the spinal cord injury research fund authorized pursuant to the Roman Reed Spinal Cord Injury Research Act of 1999 the amount of one million dollars ($1,000,000).