|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 446, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6095.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4252.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 1675.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|