LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB715
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB715
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB715
Compare Versions
AB715 Chaptered September 19, 2014
AB715 Enrolled August 20, 2014
AB715 Amended June 16, 2014
AB715 Amended June 25, 2013
AB715 Amended June 24, 2013
AB715 Amended May 14, 2013
AB715 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB715 Chaptered September 19, 2014
AB715 Enrolled August 20, 2014
AB715 Amended June 16, 2014
AB715 Amended June 25, 2013
AB715 Amended June 24, 2013
AB715 Amended May 14, 2013
AB715 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare