|
10/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 616, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 3036.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2187.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|