California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB719 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013