|
06/23/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5440.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3757.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1333.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|