LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB747
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB747
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB747
Compare Versions
AB747 Chaptered June 23, 2014
AB747 Enrolled June 11, 2014
AB747 Amended May 28, 2013
AB747 Amended April 8, 2013
AB747 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB747 Chaptered June 23, 2014
AB747 Enrolled June 11, 2014
AB747 Amended May 28, 2013
AB747 Amended April 8, 2013
AB747 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare