California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill June 11, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013