LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB779
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB779
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB779
Compare Versions
AB779 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB779 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB779 Amended June 11, 2013
AB779 Amended March 19, 2013
AB779 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB779 Chaptered September 27, 2013
AB779 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB779 Amended June 11, 2013
AB779 Amended March 19, 2013
AB779 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare