California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013