LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB782
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB782
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB782
Compare Versions
AB782 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB782 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB782 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB782 Amended June 19, 2013
AB782 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB782 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB782 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB782 Enrolled August 23, 2013
AB782 Amended June 19, 2013
AB782 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare