Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 1575.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|