LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB793
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB793
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB793
Compare Versions
AB793 Amended June 26, 2014
AB793 Amended July 9, 2013
AB793 Amended June 25, 2013
AB793 Amended June 11, 2013
AB793 Amended May 13, 2013
AB793 Amended April 22, 2013
AB793 Amended March 21, 2013
AB793 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB793 Amended June 26, 2014
AB793 Amended July 9, 2013
AB793 Amended June 25, 2013
AB793 Amended June 11, 2013
AB793 Amended May 13, 2013
AB793 Amended April 22, 2013
AB793 Amended March 21, 2013
AB793 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare