Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 2340.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 2203.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|