LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB8
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB8
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB8
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 3, 2012
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 18, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 28, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 6, 2013
Compare
Bill
September 3, 2013
Compare
Bill
August 12, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 13, 2013
Compare