|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6240.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4610.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1383.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|